Financial history HILLINGDON BRAIN TUMOUR & BRAIN INJURY GROUP

Charity number: 1164538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £49.53k £53.61k £77.30k £132.96k £163.91k
Total expenditure £35.52k £66.92k £83.62k £112.23k £122.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £50.00k £64.14k