Accounts and annual returns KIDNEY CANCER SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1164238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 09 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 09 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 26 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 11 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 05 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 29 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window