APNA HAQ

Charity number: 1169502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NAZREEN NAZ Chair 10 August 2016 None on record
Farah Syed Trustee 19 October 2021 None on record
Shahzadi Saira Awan Trustee 19 October 2021 None on record
Sughara Aziz Trustee 18 September 2019 None on record
Carolina Meco Trustee 22 November 2021 None on record
UMME RUBAB Trustee 15 November 2019 None on record
Vathsaladevi Vasu Trustee 19 October 2021 None on record
Prof Parveen Ali Trustee 10 November 2021 None on record
SHAZIAH KHAN LLB HONOUR Trustee 17 August 2016 None on record
MS LANGATHANI NKOMO Trustee 24 April 2015 None on record