Trustees CHILDHOOD TUMOUR TRUST
Charity Number: 1165777

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunil Singh | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Ashton | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jarra | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Hodgson | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Samuel-Hubert | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Coleman | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Brooks | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Tully | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LUKE POMFRET | Trustee | 26 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.