Trustees The Parochial Church Council of the Parish of St Etheldreda with St Clement, Fulham
Charity number: 1163860

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ross Gunderson | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Jean Ellwood | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Briony Mackie | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Damian Barnes | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mylchreest | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ursula Jane Chapple | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvaine Vautel | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Bury | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Alison Power | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christian Malissard | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Mark Silvester Litton | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|||||
LISA ANNETTE JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
IRENE ELIZABETH DALEY | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.