Financial history RUSHMERE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1165779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £32.44k £63.49k £60.56k £64.52k
Total expenditure £0 £5.61k £82.19k £69.59k £56.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A