THE MOORLANDS COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity number: 1165915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Smythe Trustee 17 July 2019 None on record
PETER BACKHOUSE Trustee 01 July 2008 None on record
PATRICIA O'NEIL Trustee 07 July 1996 None on record
JAMES HOLBROUGH Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record
Barbara Daria Ainscough Trustee 19 November 2020 None on record
ANNA MARIE HOLT Trustee 31 May 2016 None on record
John Arthur Scarrow Trustee 24 February 2021 None on record