Financial history HALIFAX AND DISTRICT YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1163210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £143.87k £131.03k £127.35k £98.41k £95.42k
Total expenditure £138.05k £143.93k £121.43k £87.32k £76.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.34k