Accounts and annual returns LEEDS DEBRE SIBHAT MEDHANIALEM ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWHIDO CHURCH
Charity number: 1166384
Charity reporting is up to date (156 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2024 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2024 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 January 2023 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 June 2022 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2023 | 436 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 12 September 2020 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window