Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CHRISTOPHER'S, COVENTRY

Charity number: 1163857
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANDREW MARCH Chair 01 September 2012
ALLESLEY WELFARE CHARITY
Received: On time
BURTON EAGLE AND MORGAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARTHA FLINT AND EMMA OSMOND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOHN BARBER
Received: On time
Lucy Jane Lambert Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Stuart Arthur Hart Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
ROSEMARY LAVENS Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
JAMES ANDREW BOWMAN-POWELL Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
EMMA LOUISE BOWMAN-POWELL Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
HEATHER BEASLEY Trustee 15 April 2018
ALLESLEY WELFARE CHARITY
Received: On time
BURTON EAGLE AND MORGAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARTHA FLINT AND EMMA OSMOND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOHN BARBER
Received: On time
KATHRYN LINDA COUPE Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
MARIE LESLEY ELLIS Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
MARY MARTINA VEASEY Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
THOMAS ERIC BORRAS Trustee 12 April 2016
None on record
GRAHAM FOXWELL Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
IRENE FOXWELL Trustee 01 January 2011
None on record
PAULINE JOY BLUNT Trustee 01 April 2010
None on record
STANLEY JOHN ALDRIDGE Trustee 01 April 2010
None on record
BARBARA EDITH BELL Trustee 01 January 2009
None on record
LOUISE ALICE HICKS Trustee 01 January 2009
None on record