Financial history GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY ALDERMARY

Charity number: 1163613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £259.53k £294.02k £313.59k £361.33k £194.77k
Total expenditure £225.73k £263.73k £293.43k £330.53k £215.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £57.01k