Financial history HEALS OF MALMESBURY

Charity number: 1167780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £39.14k £20.91k £26.80k £30.43k £105.98k
Total expenditure £33.37k £17.32k £19.10k £24.80k £45.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.10k £1.62k £1.06k £1.60k