Financial history MASONIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £67.01m £70.58m £68.40m £88.67m £67.84m
Total expenditure £73.22m £80.33m £79.90m £89.11m £91.08m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £20.71m £18.80m £15.83m £21.26m £16.61m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £40.92m £42.05m £42.98m £45.40m £44.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.37m £5.52m £5.62m £8.98m £6.46m
Income - Other £12.00k £4.20m £3.97m £13.03m £50
Income - Legacies £2.49m £5.36m £2.37m £3.58m £3.59m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £70.47m £77.62m £77.49m £86.15m £88.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.75m £2.71m £2.42m £2.96m £2.40m
Expenditure - Governance £189.00k £214.00k £0 £245.00k £18.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £10.05m £12.56m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £1.15m £942.00k £1.33m £1.25m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0