Governance MASONIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 04 December 2015: Standard registration
  • 07 June 2017: Funds received from 206879 MISBOURNE LODGE NO 3375 MASONIC BENEVOLENT ASSOCIA...
  • 07 June 2017: Funds received from 209014 THE CENTRE LODGE OF AMITY BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 12 October 2017: Funds received from 289298 THE CHARTERHOUSE DEO DANTE DEDI LODGE CHARITABLE T...
  • 15 November 2018: Funds received from 214027 ALEXANDRA PALACE LODGE NO 1541 BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 08 February 2019: Funds received from 1036003 CANTIUM LODGE MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION
  • 14 June 2019: Funds received from 298751 NORE LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 07 September 2019: Funds received from 504130 THE TRINITY LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 14 November 2019: Funds received from 221823 LODGE OF INTEGRITY - NO 4563 BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 02 July 2020: Funds received from 282076 CUFFLEY LODGE NO 8950 BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 15 February 2021: Funds received from 1021780 STANLEY CLAYTON TRUST
  • 19 July 2021: Funds received from 292872 GOSPORT DIS-PLAY CLUB
  • 03 November 2021: Funds received from 288394 THE HUTTON LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 31 December 2021: Funds received from 244179 THE ROYAL SUSSEX LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 31 August 2022: Funds received from 218396 LANCASTRIAN LODGE NO 2528 BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 31 August 2022: Funds received from 270328 THE LANCASTRIAN CHAPTER BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MCF (Working name)
  • THE MASONIC FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property