Trustees MASONIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR PAUL WILLIAMS Chair 27 August 2015
None on record
Bruce Walker Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
James M Long Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
DAVID SOUTHERN Trustee 10 June 2021
MASONIC CARE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ROYAL MASONIC BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION CARE COMPANY
Received: On time
WHITLEY CHAPEL PARISH HALL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 63 days late
Stephen Robinson Trustee 08 March 2021
ANCHOR LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND 1337
Received: On time
YORKSHIRE FUNDERS
Recently registered
Dr Simon Morris Fellerman Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Clive Lewis Emerson Trustee 13 June 2019
THE WILTSHIRE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Sinead Mary Brophy Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
ALAN PHILIP GRAHAM MBE Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
HOWARD GERALD WILSON Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
JOHN BOYINGTON CBE Trustee 27 August 2015
MASONIC CARE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ROYAL MASONIC BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION CARE COMPANY
Received: On time
MR Simon D'OLIER DUCKWORTH OBE, DL Trustee 27 August 2015
ST LAWRENCE JEWRY GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE LIEUTENANCY OF LONDON JUBILEE SHOOTING PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
MICHAEL RICHARD HEENAN Trustee 27 August 2015
STAFFORD TOWN FOOTBALL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE HARRY WILSON KEYS MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
STAFFORDSHIRE& BIRMINGHAM AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
MASONIC CHARITABLE SERVICES
Received: On time
Andrew George Wauchope Trustee 27 August 2015
ICAEW FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SIR HALLEY STEWART TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROYAL MASONIC SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Received: On time
THE HARROW MISSION
Received: On time
ANTONY DAVID GEORGE HARVEY Trustee 27 August 2015
B-P JAM ROLL LIMITED
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER GEOFFREY JOHN HEAD Trustee 27 August 2015
None on record