SUBULUS SALAAM

Charity number: 1168638
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 May 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 May 2020 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required