ACROSS BORDERS

Charity number: 1170882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 March 2019 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 April 2019 84 days late Download