Financial history SAM'S DIAMONDS

Charity number: 1164671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £29.78k £21.95k £57.72k £62.08k £53.86k
Total expenditure £15.57k £28.45k £44.08k £47.90k £54.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.53k N/A