Accounts and annual returns THE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION OF ST ANDREWS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1164041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required