Accounts and annual returns Redstone Foundation

Charity number: 1173078
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 July 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 05 January 2022 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 August 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 January 2020 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required