Financial history STOCKPORT UNIT 318 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 506976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.41k £8.00k £32.67k £2.95k £10.29k
Total expenditure £8.06k £15.49k £21.43k £5.83k £11.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £25.00k N/A N/A