Dogfen lywodraethu HALTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 APRIL 1977 AS AMENDED 12 SEPTEMBER 1978, 25 JUNE 1984, 24 JANUARY 2007 AND 27 FEBRUARY 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HALTON-WITH-AUGHTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND ENVIRONMENTAL AWARENESS, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AD LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (C) TO PROVIDE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE PUBLIC AREA SURROUNDING THE COMMUNITY CENTRE, WHICH OCCUPIES LAND PREVIOUSLY USED AS A LANDFILL SITE AND ENSURE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT
Maes buddion
PARISH OF HALTON-WITH-AUGHTON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.