Accounts and annual returns HAMPEL FAMILY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1166687
Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 282 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 282 days | |
Annual return | 21 September 2021 | 07 October 2023 | 443 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2021 | 07 October 2023 | 443 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 September 2020 | 07 October 2023 | 808 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2020 | 07 October 2023 | 808 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 September 2019 | 29 May 2023 | 1042 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2019 | 29 May 2023 | 1042 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 September 2018 | 07 March 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2018 | 07 March 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window