Financial history FRIENDS OF DROXFORD CHURCH

Charity number: 1165874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £24.58k £23.89k £184.21k £26.69k £1.68k
Total expenditure £11.54k £15.11k £225.81k £30.07k £2.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £75.00k £16.20k N/A