Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE BENEFICE OF ST STEPHEN'S, GATEACRE

Charity number: 1164672
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £124.52k £322.55k £141.49k £82.55k £77.26k
Total expenditure £125.83k £138.79k £128.74k £109.72k £76.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A