MR BEE'S FAMILY CENTRE (KING'S LYNN)

Charity number: 1169475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 October 2020 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 October 2020 248 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 August 2019 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 August 2019 203 days late Download