Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, BURGESS HILL

Charity number: 1165166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £133.11k £144.94k £147.11k £143.17k £99.22k
Total expenditure £159.66k £135.89k £142.72k £156.42k £93.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k £0 N/A N/A £11.23k