Financial history FAMILY FIRST

Charity number: 1166175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £27.11k £35.67k £36.50k £44.65k £20.78k
Total expenditure £16.91k £18.87k £26.19k £32.79k £37.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £500 N/A £6.64k