Financial history THE ODDBALLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £97.90k £76.50k £135.05k £340.68k £408.78k
Total expenditure £98.84k £91.30k £113.15k £331.26k £395.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A