125 GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 1167120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 April 2017 On time Download