125 GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 1167120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £80.40k £60.12k £124.49k £139.76k £51.16k
Total expenditure £34.07k £60.18k £54.83k £111.97k £58.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A