Accounts and annual returns SUPPORTING HOMELESS, ASSISTING REFUGEES EVERYWHERE

Charity number: 1166530
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 March 2018 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late Download Open in new window