THE PARISH OF PONTYPRIDD PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1165251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £482.55k £364.91k £350.33k £368.06k £310.65k
Total expenditure £518.34k £419.79k £360.08k £354.35k £292.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £14.99k £25.45k £32.80k