Financial history Calderdale Safety Initiatives

Charity number: 1164530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £48.58k £40.81k £48.76k £48.76k £42.20k
Total expenditure £51.51k £47.27k £46.06k £41.49k £33.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.00k N/A £22.60k £7.50k N/A