FRIENDS OF EASTFIELD ACADEMY

Charity number: 1166347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 July 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 July 2018 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required