Accounts and annual returns HOPE FOR SOUTHALL STREET HOMELESS

Charity number: 1164674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window