Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, LAPWORTH

Charity number: 1165322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window