Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, LAPWORTH

Charity number: 1165322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PATRICK HOARE GERARD Chair 05 May 2010
MELSON MEMORIAL PARK
Received: On time
THE WILLSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE LAPWORTH CHARITY
Recently registered
LAPWORTH OLD SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Elizabeth Mary Kenny Trustee 25 April 2022
THE WILLSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Michele Judith Twelftree Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
KATHY BAINES Trustee 26 June 2017
THE WILLSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
LAPWORTH SCARECROW FESTIVAL
Received: On time
IAN THOMAS KNOWLES Trustee 26 January 2016
THE LAPWORTH CHARITY
Recently registered
ANTHONY CARVER Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record
JACKIE TOOKEY Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record
RONA BIRD Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record
NORMA CHRISTINE ASLIN Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record
ALEXANDER IAN JACKSON Trustee 28 April 2015
THE WILLSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF OPERATIONS ENGINEERS
Received: On time
LAPWORTH OLD SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
MIKE PARKES Trustee 28 April 2014
MELSON MEMORIAL PARK
Received: On time
THE WILLSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
LAPWORTH OLD SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
HUGH OWEN ROBERTS Trustee 16 March 2013
THE LAPWORTH CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LAPWORTH CHARITY
Recently registered
LAPWORTH OLD SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time