Accounts and annual returns THE SCUNTHORPE HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 507295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 March 2022 499 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 January 2020 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 January 2020 83 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 January 2019 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 November 2017 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required