Accounts and annual returns THE STRADBROKE TRUST

Charity number: 1165750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 07 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 07 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 11 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 11 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 24 June 2019 116 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window