Financial history THE STRADBROKE TRUST

Charity number: 1165750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £7.03k £1.49k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £917 £260
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A