STOKESLEY AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 507339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 19 November 2020 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 19 November 2020 692 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 24 February 2018 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1369 days
Annual return 28 February 2016 10 October 2017 286 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 October 2017 286 days late Download