Financial history HENOCQ LAW TRUST

Charity number: 1167312
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £400.00k £6.91m £34.99k £17.79k £20.36k
Total expenditure £323.18k £188.84k £1.16m £749.68k £1.01m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £6.90m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £10.63k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £236 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £154.06k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £34.79k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.30k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £150.70k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £34.79k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A