Financial history ENGLISH+

Charity number: 1169790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £82.77k £83.08k £112.52k £137.49k £133.85k
Total expenditure £69.21k £86.10k £93.08k £93.08k £109.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A