Financial history BABY BASICS NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1168449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £35.84k £41.56k £50.48k £87.36k £56.37k
Total expenditure £31.51k £40.31k £63.13k £67.16k £57.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £280 £7.42k £1.37k