Financial history THE PEEK VISION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.01m £3.20m £2.94m £4.13m £3.44m
Total expenditure £1.54m £2.64m £2.68m £2.97m £2.83m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.94m £1.75m £879.15k £1.55m £862.94k
Income - Other trading activities £71.65k £27.12k £25.30k £15.36k £1.04k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.40m £2.00m £2.55m £2.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £24.41k £36.46k £12.50k £39.71k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.54m £2.52m £2.68m £2.96m £2.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £93.78k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £64.11k £54.45k £59.57k £65.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £126.06k £541 £5.06k £5.78k