Accounts and annual returns ASHISH CHARITY TRUST (ACT)

Charity number: 1169036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 January 2021 04 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 January 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 January 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 January 2018 10 January 2019 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 January 2018 Not Required