ADUR BANGLADESHI MUSLIM SOCIETY

Charity number: 1168232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 12 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 12 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 23 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 30 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download