THE PHOENIX THEATRE & ARTS CENTRE

Charity number: 1166858
Charity reporting is up to date (100 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 May 2021 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 May 2021 100 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 March 2020 60 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2018 On time Download