Trustees JAZZ NORTH-EAST LIMITED

Charity number: 507509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Pope Chair 28 February 2018
None on record
James Alistair Smith Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Toshitaka Zenimoto Trustee 08 January 2020
None on record
Melanie Grundy Trustee 15 December 2017
MUSICIANS BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Rachael Purvis Trustee 15 December 2017
None on record
Ken Drew Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
John Charles McGovern Trustee 25 November 2013
None on record